Global patent index - EP 0918022 A3

EP 0918022 A3 2000-01-26 - Packaging of plant parts

Title (en)

Packaging of plant parts

Title (de)

Verpackung für Pflanzenteilen

Title (fr)

Emballage pour parties de plantes

Publication

EP 0918022 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98308953 A

Priority

GB 9723100 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0918022A2] Plant parts, particularly potatoes, are packed in enclosures such as plastic bags designed so that the respiration of the plant parts generates a stable modified atmosphere which enhances the storage lifetime. Nylon film allows the escape of water vapour. Limited communication with the atmosphere, e.g. using non-gastight seals and/or micropores, enables oxygen levels to reach a dynamic equilibrium. In potatoes, oxygen level are desirably 2-14%, more preferably 3-8% by volume. This suppresses greening and sprouting. Excessively low oxygen levels can allow anaerobic organisms and processes, leading to spoilage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/20 (2006.01); B65D 85/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/52 (2013.01); B65D 81/2084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0918022 A2 19990526; EP 0918022 A3 20000126; GB 9723100 D0 19980107

INPADOC legal status

2001-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-11-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI