Global Patent Index - EP 0918023 B1

EP 0918023 B1 2000-07-19 - Device for extemporaneously mixing two products

Title (en)

Device for extemporaneously mixing two products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum unmittelbaren Vermischen von zwei Produkten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le mélange extemporané de deux produits

Publication

EP 0918023 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402672 A

Priority

FR 9714723 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0918023A1] The bowl-shaped container (1) with a lid (10) has two chambers (6, 7) separated by a sleeve (5) actuated by a retraction mechanism (17) of a sliding or screw system inside a base (3) integrally molded with the container. When the sleeve is retracted the two products are in mutual contact ready for mixing. The sleeve is made from a rigid or semi-rigid material, retracted through a passage surrounding the base (13) of the inner chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/08 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3255 (2013.01); B65D 81/3222 (2013.01); Y10S 215/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0918023 A1 19990526; EP 0918023 B1 20000719; AR 012757 A1 20001108; DE 69800222 D1 20000824; DE 69800222 T2 20010426; ES 2150811 T3 20001201; FR 2771383 A1 19990528; FR 2771383 B1 19991231; JP 3024110 B2 20000321; JP H11236079 A 19990831; US 6148995 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071027

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061028

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061028

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061027

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061027

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051020

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150811 T3

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800222 20000824

2000-07-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990924

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990924

2000-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990615

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI