Global Patent Index - EP 0918103 A3

EP 0918103 A3 2000-03-15 - Method and device for obtaining pure weft waste of catch selvedges

Title (en)

Method and device for obtaining pure weft waste of catch selvedges

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen von sortenreinem Schussfadenabfall aus fangleisten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour obtenir des déchets de fil de trame purs des lisières de retenue

Publication

EP 0918103 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114508 A

Priority

DE 19743611 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19743611A1] To recover waste weft material from a catch selvage, sorted according to weft types, the full-cross leno is twisted out after the catch selvage has been cut from the woven fabric. The weft ends and the leno yarns are taken off separately. In an Independent claim, the apparatus has a control (8) to take off the material. A unit (5) to twist out the full-cross leno (1a) is on a linear extension of the catch selvage (1). A takeoff unit (6) is between the twisting unit (5) and the catch selvage (1), and a takeoff (7) leads the leno yarns (4) away. Preferred Features:- The working stages are effected by units with electrical controls. The twisting out of the full-cross leno is synchronized or is asynchronous with its formation, using an electrically controlled untwisting mechanism, with reversing rotation. The leno yarns are taken off by an electrically controlled takeoff. The weft ends are separated, and collected separately according to the weft types, and the leno yarns are collected separately. The wefts are collected separately, by type, by an electrically controlled waste removal system or by a common electrical drive, operating according to the sequence of weft insertions during fabric weaving, and the weft selection program. The unit (5) to twist out the full-cross leno (1a) has a rotating body (5a) to take the leno yarns (4), with reversible rotation. The rotary drive (5b) for the rotating body (5a) is an external electric motor. Alternatively the rotating body (5a) is the rotor of an electrically controlled setting motor. The weft ends (3a) are extracted (6a) as they move past the cleaning point, to be taken to at least one collection point (6b). The takeoff (7), for the leno yarns (4), has a pair of rollers (7a,7b) with at least one powered roller (7a) as the loom fabric take-in roller with the idle roller (7b) pressed against it. The leno yarn (4) takeoff (7) can also be a pair of rotated bobbins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/04 (2006.01); D03C 7/04 (2006.01); D03D 47/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/40 (2013.01); D03C 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19743611 A1 19990415; DE 19743611 C2 20010523; EP 0918103 A2 19990526; EP 0918103 A3 20000315; EP 0918103 B1 20040303; JP H11140749 A 19990525

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINDAUER DORNIER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050831

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050803

2006-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040621

2004-07-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040628

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810896 P 20040408

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020809

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI