Global Patent Index - EP 0918107 B1

EP 0918107 B1 2004-12-08 - Base for fixing a profile

Title (en)

Base for fixing a profile

Title (de)

Sockel zur Befestigung eines Profilstabes

Title (fr)

Culot pour fixage d'un profilé

Publication

EP 0918107 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98119354 A

Priority

DE 19751159 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0918107A2] The profiled rods engage with one or more wall sections (100, 110) integrally formed from a base plate (85). Two or more vertical wall sections extending at right angles to each other are provided on the top side of a square base plate, forming square surface regions which receive the ends of the rod and contain holes for screws used to fasten the rods into position. Recessed grooves extending in the rod length direction are engaged with the wall sections. An Independent claim is also included for a protective fence constructed from the rods and base units.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 9/011; E01F 13/02; E04F 11/18; E04H 12/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/681 (2016.01); E01F 13/02 (2006.01); E04C 3/32 (2006.01); E04H 12/22 (2006.01); E04H 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/163 (2013.01); E01F 9/681 (2016.02); E01F 13/022 (2013.01); E04C 3/32 (2013.01); E04H 12/2261 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19751159 A1 19990520; EP 0918107 A2 19990526; EP 0918107 A3 20020612; EP 0918107 B1 20041208; ES 2232906 T3 20050601

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171103

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171206

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141015

2015-06-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232906 T3

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050319

2005-02-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812359 P 20050113

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031111

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 01F 9/011 A, 7E 04H 12/22 B, 7E 01F 13/02 B, 7E 04F 11/18 B

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI