Global patent index - EP 0918120 A3

EP 0918120 A3 2000-03-22 - Burial vault with a lower element forming a cavity

Title (en)

Burial vault with a lower element forming a cavity

Title (de)

Grabkammer mit einem einen Hohlraum bildenden Unterteil

Title (fr)

Caveau funéraire avec un élément inférieur formant une cavité

Publication

EP 0918120 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98710018 A

Priority

  • DE 19751753 A
  • DE 19850083 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0918120A2] A burial container has a trough shape (2), with or without a bottom, and with an upper lip onto which is placed a seal (10) and a lid. One end of the trough has a raised support (5) for a tombstone and an aperture (4) into which a vent pipe is fitted. The vent is fitted with a filter, accessible from the surface and the container is designed for shallow burial. The lid can be covered by a flat tombstone or by a shallow container for earth, to blend the grave into the surroundings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 13/005 (2013.01); E04H 13/00 (2013.01); E04H 13/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0918120 A2 19990526; EP 0918120 A3 20000322

INPADOC legal status

2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000923

2001-01-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI