Global Patent Index - EP 0918128 A3

EP 0918128 A3 2000-05-31 - Jacking device

Title (en)

Jacking device

Title (de)

Hebevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de levage

Publication

EP 0918128 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309463 A

Priority

GB 9724582 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0918128A2] A jacking device 1 is disclosed which comprises a tubular member 2 adapted to be received in a first end of an aperture through a door frame or window frame, and having a threaded internal surface and an elongate head portion 8 having screw holes 9. A jacking device 1 also comprises a jacking member 3 having a threaded external surface adapted to be received in the tubular member 2 and to engage the threaded internal surface of the tubular member, and a head portion 18 for engaging a wall surrounding the door frame and/or window frame. The jacking member 3 is adapted to be engaged in use by the interior of the tubular member 2 from a second end of the aperture in the door frame or window frame to rotate the jacking member 3 relative to the tubular member 2 to cause axial relative movement between said members to bring the head portion 18 into engagement with the wall. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/6076 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0918128 A2 19990526; EP 0918128 A3 20000531; GB 9724582 D0 19980121

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI