Global Patent Index - EP 0918132 A3

EP 0918132 A3 2000-04-05 - Automatic floor seal for a door

Title (en)

Automatic floor seal for a door

Title (de)

Automatische Tür-Bodendichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif automatique d'étanchéité de sol pour une porte

Publication

EP 0918132 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122264 A

Priority

DE 29720854 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0918132A2] The rail (12) with sealing member (13) is fastened to the door leaf (1) at an angle to the plane of the door (6). Movement plane (5) of the rail forms an acute angle with the door plane. When the door is closed, the sealing member (13) projects into the plane of a stationary lateral stop members. The rail is preferably fitted with its mechanism in a section (4) let into the underside (2) of the door.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/215

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/215 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/215 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29720854 U1 19990401; EP 0918132 A2 19990526; EP 0918132 A3 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001006

2001-01-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI