Global Patent Index - EP 0918138 A3

EP 0918138 A3 2000-02-02 - Device with rotary pistons circulating in a ring shaped space, enclosing an expansion chamber

Title (en)

Device with rotary pistons circulating in a ring shaped space, enclosing an expansion chamber

Title (de)

Vorrichtung mit mindestens zwei in einem Ringraum umlaufenden, eine Expansionskammer begrenzenden Rotationskolben

Title (fr)

Dispositif à pistons rotatifs circulant dans un espace en forme de bague, délimitant une chambre d'expansion

Publication

EP 0918138 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119357 A

Priority

DE 19745449 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19745449A1] The rotary piston device has at least two rotary pistons running round in an annular cavity, bounding at least one expansion chamber in the cavity at front and back. The rotary pistons are connected by a transmission device to a common torque transmission shaft (22) so that the volume of the expansion chambers in the running direction is alternately contracted and expanded. The transmission device between the shaft and at least one of the pistons has at least one cranked cardan joint (23,24) which is not compensated in respect of its cycling rotary phase shift.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01C 1/063; F02B 53/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 1/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01C 1/07 (2013.01); F02B 2053/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19745449 A1 19990429; EP 0918138 A2 19990526; EP 0918138 A3 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2001-05-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRUEMMER, HERMANN

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI