Global Patent Index - EP 0918148 A3

EP 0918148 A3 2001-01-03 - Exhaust manifold flange

Title (en)

Exhaust manifold flange

Title (de)

Auspuffkrümmerflansch

Title (fr)

Bride de collecteur d'échappement

Publication

EP 0918148 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121752 A

Priority

DE 29720941 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0918148A2] The gasket is made in at least two forms from overlapping connected sheet metal plates, (11-13,21-23) with apertures (411-414) aligned with the cylinder exhaust ports. There are fixing apertures (111-113,121-127,131-133) fitting on studs on the engine block. The gasket consists of at least two part gaskets (11,12,13). The plates of adjacent part gaskets overlap in the region of at least one fixing aperture (127,125). The contact surfaces in the overlapping region may be suitably coated. The fixing apertures at the overlapping points may be enlarged to allow for possible relative movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/10; F01N 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/10 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29720941 U1 19980319; EP 0918148 A2 19990526; EP 0918148 A3 20010103; EP 0918148 B1 20020904; JP 3713394 B2 20051109; JP H11229870 A 19990824; US 6155045 A 20001205

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805395

- Representative's name: STT SOZIETAET THEWS & THEWS, DE

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-03-05 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805395 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020227

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI