Global Patent Index - EP 0918154 A3

EP 0918154 A3 2000-03-15 - Cylinder head for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Cylinder head for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Zylinderkopf für eine Verbrennungskraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Culasse pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0918154 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122007 A

Priority

JP 31805197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0918154A2] Separate bearing blocks for the two camshafts are fitted to the ends of the cylinder block by fasteners. The camshaft blocks are carry timing adjusters. Each camshaft block has two alignment pegs for accurate positioning on the cylinder head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/38; F01L 1/02; F01L 1/053; F01L 1/344; F01M 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/04 (2006.01); F01L 1/02 (2006.01); F01L 1/053 (2006.01); F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F01L 1/344 (2006.01); F01M 9/10 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02F 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/02 (2013.01); F01L 1/022 (2013.01); F01L 1/053 (2013.01); F01L 1/34 (2013.01); F01L 1/34406 (2013.01); F01M 9/10 (2013.01); F02F 1/38 (2013.01); F01L 2001/0475 (2013.01); F01L 2001/0537 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34433 (2013.01); F01L 2001/3444 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34496 (2013.01); F02B 2275/18 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01); F02F 2007/0063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0918154 A2 19990526; EP 0918154 A3 20000315; EP 0918154 B1 20060531; DE 59813570 D1 20060706; JP 3847428 B2 20061122; JP H11148426 A 19990602; US 6035817 A 20000314

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111119

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111119

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101117

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060920

2006-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59813570

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-07-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-05-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020404

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02F 1/38 A, 7F 01L 1/02 B, 7F 01L 1/053 B, 7F 01L 1/344 B, 7F 01M 9/10 B

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI