Global Patent Index - EP 0918197 A3

EP 0918197 A3 2001-05-16 - Assembly for a compact heating installation

Title (en)

Assembly for a compact heating installation

Title (de)

Baueinheit für eine Kompaktheizungsanlage

Title (fr)

Ensemble pour installation de chauffage compact

Publication

EP 0918197 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121981 A

Priority

DE 19751515 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0918197A2] A compact hating system for central heating and for hot water preparation has the circulating pump (2) and pump motor (1) fitted to one side of a central housing (3) which combines all the components of the unit. The housing has the inlet to the pump, the control valve for the heating and warm water circuits, the air venting control etc. The whole assembly provides a heating module to fit into a domestic heating circuit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/14; F24H 1/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/48 (2006.01); F24H 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/14 (2013.01); F24H 1/48 (2013.01); F24H 9/142 (2013.01); Y02B 30/108 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0918197 A2 19990526; EP 0918197 A3 20010516; EP 0918197 B1 20051026; EP 0918197 B2 20140507; DE 19751515 A1 19990610; DE 19751515 C2 19991202; DE 59813138 D1 20051201

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171011

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171006

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-09-03 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2014-06-12 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59813138

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-05-07 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2014-05-07 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59813138

2006-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: WILO AG

2006-08-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WILO AG

- Effective date: 20060721

2006-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813138 P 20051201

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030820

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI