Global Patent Index - EP 0918265 B1

EP 0918265 B1 2002-09-11 - Generator driving device for small instruments

Title (en)

Generator driving device for small instruments

Title (de)

Generatorantriebsvorrichtung für kleine Instrumente

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement d'un générateur pour instrument de petit volume

Publication

EP 0918265 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97120561 A

Priority

EP 97120561 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0918265A1] An energy generator (1) as used in a wrist watch is driven by an oscillating weight (2) through a gear train (3). The gear train (3) includes a displaceable gear wheel (7) which is normally held centrally in a crescent shaped slot (16) by spring arms (11,12). Under shock conditions the gear wheel (7) moves along the slot (16) and is temporarily disengaged from the gear train (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0918265 A1 19990526; EP 0918265 B1 20020911; DE 69715427 D1 20021017; DE 69715427 T2 20030522

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-09-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715427

- Effective date: 20120601

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020911

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715427 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011121

2000-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991126

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI