Global Patent Index - EP 0918338 B1

EP 0918338 B1 2000-03-29 - Encapsulating composition for use on spliced cable

Title (en)

Encapsulating composition for use on spliced cable

Title (de)

Einbettzusammensetzung für gespleisstes Kabel

Title (fr)

Composition d'encapsulage pour câble épissé

Publication

EP 0918338 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98309194 A

Priority

US 97413897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0918338A1] An encapsulating material for use on the spliced connections of cable connectors is disclosed. The encapsulating material protects the spliced connections from signal disruptions attributable to both moisture and debris transported onto the cable connectors by insects. The encapsulating material is a mixture of a styrene-rubber block copolymer and a microbe-resistant extender material. Microbe-resistant extender materials that are hydrophobic include branched hydrocarbon compounds and silicon compounds. The encapsulating material optionally includes polyethylene. The polyethylene improves the flow resistance of the encapsulating material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 53/00 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01); H01B 7/28 (2006.01); H01B 7/282 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/28 (2013.01); H01B 7/282 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0918338 A1 19990526; EP 0918338 B1 20000329; DE 69800110 D1 20000504; DE 69800110 T2 20001116; JP H11256054 A 19990921

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-21 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Effective date: 20141015

2014-05-16 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20140410

2013-12-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALCATEL-LUCENT USA INC.

- Effective date: 20131122

2013-11-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131031 AND 20131106

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800110 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990720

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981126

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI