Global Patent Index - EP 0918344 A3

EP 0918344 A3 2000-04-26 - Switch device and electronic devices using the switch device

Title (en)

Switch device and electronic devices using the switch device

Title (de)

Schalter und Elektronisches Gerät die dieser Schalter verwendet

Title (fr)

Interrupteur et dispositifs électroniques utilisant cet interrupteur

Publication

EP 0918344 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98308678 A

Priority

  • JP 31945897 A
  • JP 22165498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0918344A2] According to the construction of the switch device of the present invention, spring means (5) are used, as both a return spring for an operating member (6) and a movable contact, the operating member being for operating a switch portion (S1) and a push switch. Consequently, the switch device of the present invention is smaller in the number of components used, less expensive and superior in productivity as compared with the conventional switch device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 25/06 (2006.01); H01H 25/00 (2006.01); H01H 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 25/008 (2013.01); H01H 1/242 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0918344 A2 19990526; EP 0918344 A3 20000426; EP 0918344 B1 20030924; CN 1114931 C 20030716; CN 1218268 A 19990602; DE 69818398 D1 20031030; DE 69818398 T2 20040701; JP 3763676 B2 20060405; JP H11213819 A 19990806

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081023

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081023

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-06-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070815

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061027

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69818398 P 20031030

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI