Global Patent Index - EP 0918369 A3

EP 0918369 A3 2000-02-23 - Device for connecting cable cores

Title (en)

Device for connecting cable cores

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von Kabeladern

Title (fr)

Dispositif de raccordement de conducteurs électriques

Publication

EP 0918369 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119013 A

Priority

DE 19751699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0918369A2] The arrangement has an insulating body (1) and contact holders. At least one connecting element with two contact elements in different circuit planes is inserted into the contact holders. At least one contact element is connected to a slider (4,18) guided in the connection region and which can be forced into the contact slot of the contact element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H02G 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2433 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0918369 A2 19990526; EP 0918369 A3 20000223; AU 739932 B2 20011025; AU 8927498 A 19990610; DE 19751699 A1 19990610; DE 19751699 C2 20020214; JP H11243614 A 19990907; US 6007367 A 19991228

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADC GMBH

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRONE GMBH

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI