Global Patent Index - EP 0918532 A4

EP 0918532 A4 2001-01-03 - A NOVEL METHOD OF DETECTING AND TREATING CANCER

Title (en)

A NOVEL METHOD OF DETECTING AND TREATING CANCER

Title (de)

NEUARTIGES VERFAHREN ZUR ENTDECKUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS

Title (fr)

NOUVEAU PROCEDE DE DETECTION ET DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER

Publication

EP 0918532 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97934361 A

Priority

  • US 9713550 W
  • US 69147996 A
  • US 71474496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9805349A1] The present invention provides a new method for diagnosing and treating cancers or BPH. Further provided are therapeutic agents and pharmaceutical compositions for treating cancers and BPH.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/574

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A61K 31/7105 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 38/46 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/08 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/18 (2006.01); C12N 9/20 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/573 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/0011 (2013.01); C12N 9/18 (2013.01); G01N 33/57434 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); G01N 2333/92 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] FAAS F H ET AL: "Increased phospholipid fatty acid remodeling in human and rat prostatic adenocarcinoma tissues.", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, vol. 156, no. 1, July 1996 (1996-07-01), pages 243 - 248, XP000960527
  • [Y] YAMASHITA S-I ET AL: "Overexpression of group II phospholipase A2 in human breast cancer tissues is closely associated with their malignant potency", CANCER, vol. 69, 1994, pages 1166 - 1170, XP002920714
  • See also references of WO 9805349A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9805349 A1 19980212; AU 3743997 A 19980225; CA 2262624 A1 19980212; EP 0918532 A1 19990602; EP 0918532 A4 20010103; JP 2001500847 A 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020929

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010911

2001-01-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01N 33/574 A

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990203

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE