Global Patent Index - EP 0918580 B1

EP 0918580 B1 2000-08-16 - DEVICE FOR MOVING PART OF A MACHINE AND FOR EXERTING A FORCE AT THE END OF ITS STROKE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MOVING PART OF A MACHINE AND FOR EXERTING A FORCE AT THE END OF ITS STROKE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERSCHIEBEN EINES TEILS EINER MASCHINE UND AUSÜBEN EINER KRAFT AM BEWEGUNGSENDE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR DEPLACER UNE PARTIE D'UNE MACHINE ET EXERCER UN EFFORT EN FIN DE COURSE

Publication

EP 0918580 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97931892 A

Priority

  • FR 9701226 W
  • FR 9608639 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9801244A1] This device comprises: a first assembly (10, 12, 14) for moving the machine part; a second assembly (18, 22) driven in rotation mounted on at least one bearing; a linking piece (16) mounted via a first linking axis (30) on the first assembly and via a second linking axis (34) on the second assembly, the axis (40) defined by the at least one bearing being offset relative to the second linking axis (34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/045 (2013.01); B21D 5/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9801244 A1 19980115; AT 195447 T 20000915; DE 69702860 D1 20000921; DE 69702860 T2 20010301; EP 0918580 A1 19990602; EP 0918580 B1 20000816; FR 2750625 A1 19980109; FR 2750625 B1 19990129

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050707

2003-05-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020707

2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-07-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020707

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: JEANDEAUD JEAN-CLAUDE

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010713

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010713

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010713

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-11-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-10-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702860 20000921

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-08-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195447 T 20000915

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990701

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990125

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE