Global Patent Index - EP 0918581 B1

EP 0918581 B1 2000-06-14 - HEAT SHIELD PANEL

Title (en)

HEAT SHIELD PANEL

Title (de)

HITZESCHILD

Title (fr)

BOUCLIER THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 0918581 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97932924 A

Priority

  • GB 9701975 W
  • GB 9616882 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9806517A1] A panel (10) is formed from a sheet (12) of metal. The method comprises corrugating the sheet (12) with corrugations which extend parallel to one another in a first direction, and corrugating the already corrugated sheet (12) with corrugations which extend parallel to one another in a second direction, said second direction being inclined at an angle of at least 10 DEG to said first direction. The panel (10) is formed into a plurality of generally parallel upstanding ridges (20) separated by troughs (22). The troughs (22) have reentrant side walls (24). Each ridge (20) varies in width along its length in a regular manner and varies in height along the length of the ridge with the greatest height occuring at the narrowest points of the ridge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 13/04; E04C 2/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/34 (2006.01); B21D 13/04 (2006.01); B21D 13/10 (2006.01); E04C 2/08 (2006.01); E04C 2/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 13/10 (2013.01); B21D 13/04 (2013.01); E04C 2/08 (2013.01); E04C 2/326 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806517 A1 19980219; AU 3628997 A 19980306; BR 9711118 A 19990908; DE 69702317 D1 20000720; DE 69702317 T2 20010215; EP 0918581 A1 19990602; EP 0918581 B1 20000614; ES 2147012 T3 20000816; GB 9616882 D0 19960925; JP 2001504393 A 20010403; JP 3233364 B2 20011126

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150719

2016-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160826

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150718

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150718

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150718

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69702317

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140717

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140716

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140624

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140624

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130321 AND 20130327

2013-04-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION, US

- Effective date: 20130313

2013-03-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION (N.D.GES.D. STAATES , US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FEDERAL-MOGUL TECHNOLOGY LTD., RUGBY, GB

- Document: DE 69702317

- Effective date: 20130118

2013-03-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION (N.D.GES.D. STAATES , US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FEDERAL-MOGUL TECHNOLOGY LTD., RUGBY, WARWICKSHIRE, GB

- Document: DE 69702317

- Effective date: 20130118

2013-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69702317

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, EUROPEA, DE

- Effective date: 20130118

2013-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69702317

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20130118

2013-03-07 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20130225

2013-01-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69702317

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, EUROPEA, DE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147012 T3

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702317 20000720

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991103

1999-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 21D 13/04 A, 6E 04C 2/34 B

1999-08-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HEAT SHIELD PANEL

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990115

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT