Global patent index - EP 0918582 B1

EP 0918582 B1 2000-05-03 - HEMMING DEVICE

Title (en)

HEMMING DEVICE

Title (de)

BÖRDELVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF A BORDER

Publication

EP 0918582 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97932767 A

Priority

  • DE 29612192 U
  • EP 9703428 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6223581B1] The present invention pertains to a hemming device 1 with a hemming head 6, which has one or more hemming tools 8, 9, divided into segments 12 through 16 in the case of a plurality of hemming tools, wherein the hemming tool or hemming tools is/are provided with a hemming edge 11 rotating in the operating position. The hemming device 1 also has a stroke drive for generating the hemming stroke and an adjusting device 22 for withdrawing and extending the segments 12 through 16, which has an adjusting drive 23, which moves all segments 12 through 16 simultaneously. The segments have adapted contact surfaces 17, which have a contact angle alpha of 20° to 50°. The adjusting drive 23 is preferably designed as a crank mechanism.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/021 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53722 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29612192 U1 19971009; EP 0918582 A1 19990602; EP 0918582 B1 20000503; ES 2145620 T3 20000701; JP 2000514359 A 20001031; US 6223581 B1 20010501; WO 9802260 A1 19980122

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-06-20 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20140521

2014-06-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: KUKA SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20140521

2014-06-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140515 AND 20140521

2014-05-21 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: KUKA SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20140514

2014-04-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUKA SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59701600

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140221

2014-04-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUKA SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59701600

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140221

2014-04-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59701600

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ERNICKE UND KOLLEGEN, DE

- Effective date: 20140221

2014-02-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59701600

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ERNICKE UND KOLLEGEN, DE

2006-01-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-12-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2005-08-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145620

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701600

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990719

1999-08-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: HEMMING DEVICE

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981209

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE