Global Patent Index - EP 0918676 B1

EP 0918676 B1 2001-02-14 - AXLE DRIVE FOR RAIL VEHICLES

Title (en)

AXLE DRIVE FOR RAIL VEHICLES

Title (de)

ACHSANTRIEB FÜR SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

COMMANDE D'ESSIEU POUR VEHICULES FERROVIAIRES

Publication

EP 0918676 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97938757 A

Priority

  • DE 9701718 W
  • DE 19633944 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19633944A1] The axle drive according to the invention comprises an electric motor (2) mounted on a driving axle(1), with a shift gear (3) and a coupling (4). A compact construction form is obtained by supporting the axle drive which comprises the electric motor (2), shift gear (3) and coupling (4) on the end side of the driving axle (1) using springs and dampers (5) and with interposed axle-bearings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61C 9/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61C 9/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61C 9/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES GB PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19633944 A1 19980312; AT 199136 T 20010215; DK 0918676 T3 20010611; EP 0918676 A1 19990602; EP 0918676 B1 20010214; ES 2154907 T3 20010416; PT 918676 E 20020429; TW 352370 B 19990211; WO 9807604 A1 19980226

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110812

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 199136 T

- Effective date: 20110812

2012-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120213

2012-02-20 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120213

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100813

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100812

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703001

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100812

2011-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20100728

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100714

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091019

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090813

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090909

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-04-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-09-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2002-08-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020820

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-08 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020125

2002-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-05-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010514

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154907 T3

2001-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703001 20010322

2001-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010227

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES GB PT

2001-02-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199136 T 20010215

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990604

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990219

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES GB PT