Global Patent Index - EP 0918678 B1

EP 0918678 B1 2000-08-30 - ELECTROHYDRAULIC CONTROL DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTROHYDRAULIC CONTROL DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTROHYDRAULISCHE STEUERVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ELECTROHYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 0918678 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97930304 A

Priority

  • DE 9701145 W
  • DE 19634319 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19634319A1] This invention concerns an electrohydraulic control device (10, 60) for a hydraulic control motor for controlling a flow which is built in the form of a 4/2-directional control valve module. A control valve from seat valve technology between a motor connection (B) and a return (R) form a lowering part (11), while the corresponding reset element (44) is carried out in the form of a longitudinal gate valve (45) which controls the connection between an intake connection (P) and a motor connection (A) and is actuated by a proportional magnet (16). After release of the control valve, its seat valve body (23) is mechanically taken along by the longitudinal gate valve (45), and both flows are proprotionally controlled by means of the lowering part (11) and the raising part (12), so that in a construction with little leakage, a high degree of switching control is achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B62D 5/09; F15B 13/044

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 5/09 (2006.01); F15B 11/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/01 (2006.01); F15B 13/043 (2006.01); F15B 13/044 (2006.01); F16K 11/07 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/043 (2013.01); F15B 11/003 (2013.01); F15B 13/01 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20553 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3051 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3057 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3144 (2013.01); F15B 2211/31576 (2013.01); F15B 2211/327 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6054 (2013.01); Y10T 137/87217 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87241 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19634319 A1 19980226; EP 0918678 A1 19990602; EP 0918678 B1 20000830; JP 2000516885 A 20001219; US 6220288 B1 20010424; WO 9807611 A1 19980226

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070606

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2006-08-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-06-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030606

2002-06-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020622

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020527

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001101

2000-11-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702293 20001005

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990730

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990324

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT