Global Patent Index - EP 0918723 B1

EP 0918723 B1 2002-09-25 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR CONVEYING PRESSROOM PRODUCTS

Title (en)

PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR CONVEYING PRESSROOM PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÖRDERN VON DRUCKEREIPRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRANSPORT DE PRODUITS D'IMPRIMERIE

Publication

EP 0918723 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97929074 A

Priority

  • CH 9700266 W
  • CH 181896 A
  • CH 313096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9803422A1] A process and apparatus for conveying pressroom products (1) in a conveyor direction (F) and along a conveyor path (Z) effect transport of the pressroom products (1), which are held in the region of a lateral edge (1a) by a gripper, such that each pressroom product (1) during its conveyance, with the gripper (3) maintaining its holding action, is rotated about a rotational axis (D) which is essentially perpendicular to the lateral edge (1a) being held, which is oriented to the conveyor direction in such a way that the angle between the conveyor direction (F) and a normal (N) running at a right angle to the main surface (2) of the given pressroom product (1) is changed in order to rotate the orientation of the main surface (2) relative to the conveyor direction (F).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/04; B42C 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42C 19/08 (2006.01); B65H 29/02 (2006.01); B65H 29/04 (2006.01); B65H 29/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/60 (2013.01); B42C 19/08 (2013.01); B65H 29/003 (2013.01); B65H 39/075 (2013.01); B65H 2301/323 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5111 (2013.01); B65H 2405/55 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9803422 A1 19980129; AU 3332597 A 19980210; AU 731013 B2 20010322; DE 59708333 D1 20021031; DK 0918723 T3 20021014; EP 0918723 A1 19990602; EP 0918723 B1 20020925; US 6264192 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140712

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708333

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-03-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-02-23 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708333

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131002

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110711

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110711

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110711

2012-02-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100722

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100805

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100714

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Free text: FERAG AG#ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- FERAG AG#PATENTABTEILUNG Z. H. MARKUS FELIX ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH)

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708333 20021031

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-10-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000704

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981203

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE