Global patent index - EP 0918767 A4

EP 0918767 A4 2000-04-26 - PHARMACEUTICAL FOR TREATING OF NEUROLOGICAL AND NEUROPSYCHIATRIC DISORDERS

Title (en)

PHARMACEUTICAL FOR TREATING OF NEUROLOGICAL AND NEUROPSYCHIATRIC DISORDERS

Title (de)

PHARMAZEUTIKA ZUR BEHANDLUNG NEUROLOGISCHER UND NEUROPSYCHIATRISCHER BESCHWERDEN

Title (fr)

PRODUIT PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES NEUROLOGIQUES ET NEUROPSYCHIATRIQUES

Publication

EP 0918767 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97926837 A

Priority

  • US 9709346 W
  • US 65584796 A
  • US 80768197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9745423A1] The invention provides a pharmaceutical for treatment of neurological and neuropsychiatric disorders comprising a compound of formulas (I and II) or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 401/02; A61K 31/445; C07D 211/14; C07D 211/34; C07D 211/40; C07D 211/54; C07D 401/14; C07D 405/02; C07D 405/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 491/056 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/436 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/4525 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); C07D 207/06 (2006.01); C07D 211/14 (2006.01); C07D 211/22 (2006.01); C07D 211/42 (2006.01); C07D 211/70 (2006.01); C07D 405/04 (2006.01); C07D 491/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 405/04 (2013.01); C07D 207/06 (2013.01); C07D 211/14 (2013.01); C07D 211/22 (2013.01); C07D 211/42 (2013.01); C07D 211/70 (2013.01); C07D 491/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] IWASAKI, NOBUHIKO ET AL: "Amphoteric drugs. I. Synthesis and antiallergic activity of [4-(diphenylmethoxy)piperidino]-, [4-(diphenylmethyl)piperazinyl]- and [4-(diphenylmethylene)piperidino]alkanoic acid derivatives", CHEM. PHARM. BULL. (1994), 42(11), 2276-84, XP002128280
  • See also references of WO 9745423A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9745423 A1 19971204; AU 3151097 A 19980105; AU 737095 B2 20010809; CA 2255727 A1 19971204; EP 0918767 A1 19990602; EP 0918767 A4 20000426; JP 2001500107 A 20010109; JP 2009149663 A 20090709; JP 4403212 B2 20100127

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030925

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-04-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07D 401/02 A, 7C 07D 401/14 B, 7C 07D 405/02 B, 7C 07D 405/14 B, 7C 07D 211/40 B, 7C 07D 211/34 B, 7C 07D 211/54 B, 7A 61K 31/445 B, 7C 07D 211/14 B

1999-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALLELIX NEUROSCIENCE INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981221

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE