Global Patent Index - EP 0918841 B1

EP 0918841 B1 2002-09-11 - AQUEOUS BLEACHING AGENTS

Title (en)

AQUEOUS BLEACHING AGENTS

Title (de)

WÄSSRIGE BLEICHMITTEL

Title (fr)

AGENTS DE BLANCHIMENT AQUEUX

Publication

EP 0918841 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97924975 A

Priority

  • DE 19621820 A
  • DE 19624843 A
  • EP 9702626 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9746659A1] Proposed are aqueous bleaching agents containing 1 to 10 % by wt. of alkali-metal hypochlorites and 0.01 to 1 % by wt. of polyacrylic acid compounds. The agents reduce the deposition of metals on the fabric and the tendency of the fabric to yellow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/395; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3765 (2013.01); C11D 3/3956 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9746659 A1 19971211; EP 0918841 A1 19990602; EP 0918841 B1 20020911; ES 2182085 T3 20030301

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150523

2016-06-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160629

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150522

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708205

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140515

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182085 T3

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708205 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-05-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991217

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981121

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT