Global Patent Index - EP 0918900 B1

EP 0918900 B1 2001-12-12 - MULTI-PURPOSE CARRIER DEVICE

Title (en)

MULTI-PURPOSE CARRIER DEVICE

Title (de)

MEHRZWECK-TRÄGERGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF SUPPORT A USAGE MULTIPLE

Publication

EP 0918900 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97930421 A

Priority

  • EP 9703367 W
  • HU 9620628 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9801613A1] The invention concerns a multi-purpose carrier device, predominantly for temporarily keeping together articles of clothing which belong together, in particular for handling pairs of articles of clothing. The carrier device comprises a suitable securing unit (1) for urging the articles of clothing together, the securing unit having a primary shaped support part (2) located on one side of the articles of clothing, and a secondary shaped support part (3) located on the other side of the articles of clothing. The primary shaped support part (2) comprises a delimiting member (2a) and an opening (2d) which is at least partially framed by the delimiting member (2a). The secondary shaped support part (3) comprises a free flange (3a) which passes into and preferably through the opening (2d) in the primary shaped support part (2). The primary shaped support part (2) and the secondary shaped support part (3) are interconnected by a connector neck (4) which forms an acute angle ( alpha , beta ) with the base surface (20) of the primary shaped support part (2) and/or the base surface (30) of the secondary shaped support part (3). The primary shaped support part (2) and/or the secondary shaped support part (3) and/or the connector neck (4) consist of an elastically deformable material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 95/00; D06F 55/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/48 (2006.01); D06F 55/00 (2006.01); D06F 95/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/48 (2013.01); D06F 55/00 (2013.01); D06F 95/008 (2013.01); Y10S 24/29 (2013.01); Y10T 24/1312 (2013.01); Y10T 24/155 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3449 (2013.01); Y10T 24/44034 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9801613 A1 19980115; AT 210753 T 20011215; CN 1082585 C 20020410; CN 1227617 A 19990901; CZ 290606 B6 20020814; CZ 9900007 A3 19990616; DE 29705307 U1 19970710; DE 59705788 D1 20020124; EP 0918900 A1 19990602; EP 0918900 B1 20011212; PL 331084 A1 19990621; US 6243925 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060626

2005-08-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2005-02-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040626

2004-06-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040626

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2003-06-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030611

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BUSELMEIER SIEGFRIED

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ASZODY JOZSEF

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705788 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-12-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210753 T 20011215

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ASZODY, JOZSEF

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010201

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981216

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL