Global Patent Index - EP 0918901 B1

EP 0918901 B1 2000-12-06 - USE OF TEXTILE FINISHING AGENTS

Title (en)

USE OF TEXTILE FINISHING AGENTS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON TEXTILAUSRÜSTUNGSMITTELN

Title (fr)

USAGE D'APPRETS POUR TEXTILE

Publication

EP 0918901 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97937560 A

Priority

  • DE 19633104 A
  • EP 9704304 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19633104C1] New textile finishing agents contain (a) esterquats and (b) quaternary fatty acid imidazolines. These agents not only confer a soft, comfortable feel to flat textile structures, in particular blue denim fabrics, but also reliably stabilise them against yellowing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 13/473; D06M 13/463

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/645 (2006.01); D06M 13/46 (2006.01); D06M 13/463 (2006.01); D06M 13/473 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 13/461 (2013.01); C11D 1/645 (2013.01); D06M 13/463 (2013.01); D06M 13/473 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); D06M 2200/25 (2013.01); D06M 2200/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19633104 C1 19971016; BR 9711308 A 19990817; DK 0918901 T3 20010305; EP 0918901 A1 19990602; EP 0918901 B1 20001206; ES 2153683 T3 20010301; PT 918901 E 20010430; TR 199900274 T2 19990521; US 6402976 B1 20020611; WO 9807920 A1 19980226

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090808

2011-09-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110819

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090807

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090808

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100208

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-02-15 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100208

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-12-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20081215

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080815

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080808

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-08-29 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Free text: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG DE

- Effective date: 20030627

2002-09-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.HENKELSTRAS

2002-09-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

2002-09-30 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.HENKELSTRAS

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153683 T3

2001-02-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702736 20010111

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR IT PT

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000118

1999-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF TEXTILE FINISHING AGENTS

1999-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990208

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR IT PT