Global Patent Index - EP 0918908 B1

EP 0918908 B1 2001-03-21 - TRIGGERING OF A CLEANING, VENTILATION, AND OR DISINFECTION PROCESS

Title (en)

TRIGGERING OF A CLEANING, VENTILATION, AND OR DISINFECTION PROCESS

Title (de)

AUSLÖSUNG EINES REINIGUNGS-, LÜFTUNGS- UND/ODER DESINFEKTIONSVORGANGES

Title (fr)

DECLENCHEMENT D'UN PROCESSUS DE NETTOYAGE, DE VENTILATION ET/OU DE DESINFECTION

Publication

EP 0918908 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96926306 A

Priority

CH 9600284 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9807930A1] This invention concerns a process for actuating a physical/technical process, particularly in toilette facilities, which employs a sound sensor (M) with signal analysis which is located in close proximity to a liquid inlet (8). In a device for automatic cleaning of toilette seats (4), the sensor (M) is built in next to the flushing water inlet. The flushing noises are selected using a signal analysis circuit and cleaning of the seat (4) and evacuation of odors (G) via a ventilator (15) is only triggered if the flushing process has been clearly detected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 5/10; A47K 17/00; E03C 1/05; E03D 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 17/00 (2006.01); E03C 1/05 (2006.01); E03D 5/10 (2006.01); E03D 9/04 (2006.01); E03D 9/05 (2006.01); G01S 15/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

E03D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 5/105 (2013.01); A47K 17/00 (2013.01); E03D 5/10 (2013.01); E03D 9/04 (2013.01); Y10S 4/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9807930 A1 19980226; AT 199955 T 20010415; AU 6654296 A 19980306; CA 2262747 A1 19980226; CA 2262747 C 20070515; DE 59606650 D1 20010426; DK 0918908 T3 20010423; EP 0918908 A1 19990602; EP 0918908 B1 20010321; ES 2156999 T3 20010801; HU 9903390 A2 20000228; HU 9903390 A3 20001228; JP 2001505267 A 20010417; JP 3787163 B2 20060621; NO 990698 A 19990215; NO 990698 D0 19990215; PL 180931 B1 20010531; PL 331629 A1 19990802; PT 918908 E 20010629; SK 18599 A3 19990910; SK 285667 B6 20070503; US 6098211 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160824

2016-11-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20161125

2016-10-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 199955

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20160816

2016-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2016-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-08-22 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

- Effective date: 20160816

2016-08-17 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20160815

2016-08-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59606650

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150831

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150826

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CWS INTERNATIONAL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2011-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2009-10-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-06-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-04-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-08-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-08-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040816

2003-08-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030827

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156999

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-06-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010322

2001-06-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606650

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-04-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PPS POLYVALENT PATENT SERVICE AG

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199955

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990607

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990211

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE