Global Patent Index - EP 0918974 B1

EP 0918974 B1 2000-02-02 - DEVICE FOR INTERMITTENT DISPENSING OF AN AGENT FOR TREATING SURFACES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR INTERMITTENT DISPENSING OF AN AGENT FOR TREATING SURFACES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM GEPULSTEN AUSGEBEN EINES MEDIUMS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PROJECTION INTERMITTENTE D'UN AGENT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACES

Publication

EP 0918974 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97928096 A

Priority

  • CH 9700261 W
  • CH 201596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9808040A1] This invention concerns a device (1) for the intermittent dispensing of an agent for treating surfaces which has a rectangular frame. One or more units (12) dispensing jets of agent are vertically mounted in a hanging position at one side or two opposing sides of frame. The objects to be treated are inserted between the units (12) dispensing jets of agent of the one side of the frame and the units (12) dispensing jets of agent of the other side of the frame. The device (1) proposed has a drive which moves the units (12) dispensing jets of agent parallel and in opposing directions or parallel and in the same direction to one another. The units (12) dispensing jets of agent consist of a vertically running support rod (24) to which at least two devices (32) for dispensing jets of agent with several hollow nozzle rod (28) are affixed. The devices (32) for dispensing jets of agent can be arranged in pairs next to one another. Each nozzle rod (28) is connected to a compressed air supply (36) and/or several other medium sources and has several outlet nozzles which preferably are arranged in at least two approximately parallel longitudinal rows.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 21/00; F26B 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 5/14 (2006.01); F26B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 5/14 (2013.01); F26B 21/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9808040 A1 19980226; CH 691927 A5 20011130; DE 59701099 D1 20000309; EP 0918974 A1 19990602; EP 0918974 B1 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080703

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070723

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701099 20000309

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990622

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990211

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT