Global Patent Index - EP 0919074 B1

EP 0919074 B1 2000-04-26 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTION

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL CONNECTION

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE STECKVERBINDUNG

Title (fr)

CONNEXION ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0919074 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97937566 A

Priority

  • DE 19632905 A
  • EP 9704373 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9808277A1] The inventive electrical connection (3) includes a connector (11) having a connector base (15) with a central contact (17) and an eccentric contact (29), and a connector plug (12) provided with concentric contact sockets (41, 42) within a cylindrical female contact (36). The connector plug when clipped to the connector (11) allows the contact members of said centric contact and excentric contact (29, 17) being reached on one side and the relevant one of the concentric contact sockets (41, 42) on the other side, resulting in a snap-fastened axial connection. In order to indicate visibly to the user, when connecting, whether the contact connection is operational or not, the eccentric contact is designed as a coil spring (16), of which the end (29) is bent; upon clipping the connector plug (12) to the connector (11), said concentric contact sockets (41, 42) squeeze the coil spring (16), thereby axially joining the connector (11) and the connector plug (12) through the snap-fastening members (18, 74) arranged on the connector socket (15) and the female contact (36).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/703

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/64 (2006.01); H01R 13/646 (2011.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01); H01R 24/38 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/641 (2013.01); H01R 24/38 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9808277 A1 19980226; DE 19632905 A1 19980219; EP 0919074 A1 19990602; EP 0919074 B1 20000426; JP 2000517093 A 20001219; US 6149448 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050812

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030812

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-08-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030812

2002-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020830

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020807

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701530 20000531

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990716

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990128

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT