Global Patent Index - EP 0919143 B1

EP 0919143 B1 2002-09-18 - Distributor for tobacco for cigarette making machines

Title (en)

Distributor for tobacco for cigarette making machines

Title (de)

Tabakverteiler für eine Zigarettenstrangmaschine

Title (fr)

Distributeur de tabac pour des machines à fabriquer les cigarettes

Publication

EP 0919143 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121720 A

Priority

DE 19752717 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0919143A1] The arrangement has a stacking chute (1) supplied via an inlet open at the upper end and which opens at its outlet above an extraction pin roller (4) which spreads the tobacco to form a tissue. The chute is arranged transversely with respect to the roller axis of the extraction pin roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/34 (2006.01); A24C 5/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/39 (2013.01); A24C 5/393 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0919143 A1 19990602; EP 0919143 B1 20020918; EP 0919143 B2 20051019; AT 224152 T 20021015; CN 1110272 C 20030604; CN 1222322 A 19990714; DE 19752717 A1 19990602; ES 2181111 T3 20030216; ES 2181111 T5 20060401; JP 4435889 B2 20100324; JP H11221066 A 19990817; PL 187387 B1 20040630; PL 329907 A1 19990607; US 6170489 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171114

2018-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805598

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161205

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-21 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: HAUNI MASCHINENBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20160915

2016-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-08-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-07-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAUNI MASCHINENBAU GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG, 21033 HAMBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59805598

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-06-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20111122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081115

2010-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081115

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071116

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-28 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2006-04-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2006-02-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2005-12-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-11-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2005-11-09 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2005-10-19 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: G.D. SOCIETA PER AZIONI

2003-08-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: G.D. SOCIETAE PER AZIONI

- Effective date: 20030616

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181111 T3

2002-11-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805598 20021024

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224152 T 20021015

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011012

2000-02-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991118

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI