Global Patent Index - EP 0919160 A3

EP 0919160 A3 2000-05-03 - A base with support struts for chairs or seats, particularly of the swivelling type

Title (en)

A base with support struts for chairs or seats, particularly of the swivelling type

Title (de)

Fuss-Stern, insbesondere für Drehstühle

Title (fr)

Support de siège, notamment pour chaises tournantes

Publication

EP 0919160 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98203931 A

Priority

IT PO970268 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0919160A2] A base (2) for swivelling chairs or seats comprises a plurality of support struts (4) each of which is fixed releasably to the base. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0919160 A2 19990602; EP 0919160 A3 20000503

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001104

2001-02-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-07 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ARMET S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI