Global Patent Index - EP 0919161 A3

EP 0919161 A3 2001-04-18 - Adjustable seat

Title (en)

Adjustable seat

Title (de)

Verstellbare Sitzfläche

Title (fr)

Assise réglable

Publication

EP 0919161 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122286 A

Priority

DE 19752355 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0919161A2] The seating surface is attached to a support (2) and has at least one two-part seat surface (3) which is adjustable transversely wrt. the seating position. The parts are pivotably linked and the rear part (3b) can be pivoted upwards and downwards with respect to the front part (3a) and has a cut-out. The individual seat surface parts can be replaced by means of a removable connecting element

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/14; A47C 1/023

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/023 (2006.01); A47C 7/02 (2006.01); A47C 7/14 (2006.01); A47C 7/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/022 (2013.01); A47C 1/022 (2013.01); A47C 7/024 (2013.01); A47C 7/14 (2013.01); A47C 7/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0919161 A2 19990602; EP 0919161 A3 20010418; DE 19752355 A1 19990602; DE 19752355 C2 20011206

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-02-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 7/14 A, 7A 47C 1/023 B

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI