Global Patent Index - EP 0919314 B1

EP 0919314 B1 2000-07-26 - Apparatus for making a spout in a tin

Title (en)

Apparatus for making a spout in a tin

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Ausbildung eines Ausgusses in einem Behälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour créer des becs verseurs sur des récipients

Publication

EP 0919314 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121963 A

Priority

DE 19752373 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19752373C1] The implement has two crossed handles (4a,b) with gripper handles (5a,b) defining a gripping opening (7) via front jaw sections (6a,b). One jaw has a cutter (10) formed of two perpendicular relatively superimposable shanks (19,20). the other jaw has an anvil (11) with a curved cross section. The anvil can be positioned with respect to a container (8) so that the cutter (10) engages the outside of the container. The jaws are then moved together with the container wall clamped between them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23D 29/02; B08B 9/08; B21D 51/42; B23D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23D 29/02 (2006.01); B25B 7/02 (2006.01); B26B 27/00 (2006.01); B67B 7/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/24 (2013.01); B25B 7/02 (2013.01); B26B 27/00 (2013.01); B67B 7/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19752373 C1 19981119; AT 194936 T 20000815; EP 0919314 A1 19990602; EP 0919314 B1 20000726; ES 2149628 T3 20001101; GR 3034689 T3 20010131; US 6050123 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051119

2005-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031120

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-08-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031119

2004-06-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FIES ROBERT

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-11-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-01-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030128

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-07 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030107

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-06 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030106

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20021230

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021224

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021129

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021129

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021126

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021121

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149628 T3

2000-10-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800214 20000831

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194936 T 20000815

2000-02-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990928

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990626

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI