Global Patent Index - EP 0919376 A3

EP 0919376 A3 2000-02-23 - Bearing device for a cylindrical screen stencil

Title (en)

Bearing device for a cylindrical screen stencil

Title (de)

Lagervorrichtung für eine zylindrische Siebdruckschablone

Title (fr)

Palier pour un pochoir sérigraphique à cylindre

Publication

EP 0919376 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117853 A

Priority

  • DE 29720975 U
  • DE 29721365 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0919376A2] The bearing device has an inner bearing shell (22) mounted rotatable relative to outer bearing shell (23) through a bearing unit (21). The inner shell is also axially displaceable relative to the outer shell. The shells have axially either side of the bearing unit sealing faces (34-37) which are opposite each other in pairs in the operating position at an axial distance from each other. A tension device (33) allows the inner and outer shells to move axially from the operating to the rest position where the opposing sealing faces sealingly adjoin one another. The bearing unit is enclosed on all sides by the inner and outer shells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 15/38; B41F 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/20 (2006.01); B41F 15/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/38 (2013.01); B41F 13/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0919376 A2 19990602; EP 0919376 A3 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010721

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE IT LI NL

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MHM SALES & SERVICES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LINTNER, ALEXANDER

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 41F 15/38 A, 7B 41F 13/20 B

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI