Global Patent Index - EP 0919391 B1

EP 0919391 B1 2001-12-19 - Method for adjusting and maintaining the distance between a printing surface and a printhead and printing device for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for adjusting and maintaining the distance between a printing surface and a printhead and printing device for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Einstellen und Einhalten des Abstandes zwischen einer Druckoberfläche und einem Druckkopf und Druckvorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour ajuster et maintenir la distance entre une surface imprimante et une têtê d'impression et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 0919391 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98115261 A

Priority

DE 19742147 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19742147A1] The method involves adjusting and keeping a distance between the surface of a print carrier (14) to be imprinted, which borders on a print support (10), and a print head (24) movable in parallel to it. The print head is connected with a switch (26) which contacts the print support or the print carrier. Changes in the distance between the print carrier surface and the print support are determined during an idle pass of the print head over the inserted print carrier, according to their position within the path of the print head and to their size. The velocity of the print head is controlled during a printing pass in dependence on the position and size of the determined distance changes, in such way, that a maximum velocity is reached without distortion of the printed image.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 25/308

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 25/308 (2006.01); B41J 25/316 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 25/316 (2013.01); B41J 25/308 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19742147 A1 19990325; DE 19742147 C2 19990722; EP 0919391 A1 19990602; EP 0919391 B1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150813

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802520

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140806

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2002-10-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011219

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802520 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF GMBH & CO KG

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-02-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990520

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI