Global Patent Index - EP 0919394 B1

EP 0919394 B1 2002-09-25 - Maintenance system for a franking machine

Title (en)

Maintenance system for a franking machine

Title (de)

System zum Unterhalt einer Frankiermaschine

Title (fr)

Système pour l'entretien d'une machine à affranchir

Publication

EP 0919394 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402846 A

Priority

FR 9714562 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0919394A2] The cleaning procedure of a rotary printing head (1) and an inking roller (7) on a support (9) consists of removing the inking roller and replacing it with a cleaning roller before operating the printing head drive for a set period of time. After that time, e.g. a duration of fifteen revolutions of the printing head, the cleaning roller is removed and the inking roller put back in its original position. In a variant of the procedure the use of the cleaning roller can be followed by a drying roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41K 3/12; B41F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2006.01); B41K 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2013.01); B41K 3/123 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0919394 A2 19990602; EP 0919394 A3 19990609; EP 0919394 B1 20020925; DE 69808224 D1 20021031; DE 69808224 T2 20030605; FR 2771047 A1 19990521; FR 2771047 B1 20000211; US 6019044 A 20000201

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111117

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69808224

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111117

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030121

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808224 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991007

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI