Global patent index - EP 0919487 A3

EP 0919487 A3 2000-02-02 - Multipack

Title (en)

Multipack

Title (de)

Mehrstückverpackung

Title (fr)

Emballage pour un groupe d'articles

Publication

EP 0919487 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309591 A

Priority

GB 9724756 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2331500A] A multipack for storing chilled or frozen food or the like includes a plurality of containers 5 each tapering from a closed end to an openable end 6 of greater cross-sectional area than the closed end. The containers are arranged within an outer receptacle 2 side by side in an alternate upright and inverted configuration. The containers may be of thermoformed plastics or cardboard, with a cover at 6 of cardboard, plastics or metal foil. The outer receptacle may comprise a cardboard box 2 having a polyethylene lining and covered by plastics film 3 and a snap-on plastics lid (not shown).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00; B65D 77/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/0413 (2013.01); B65D 2577/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2331500 A 19990526; GB 9724756 D0 19980121; EP 0919487 A2 19990602; EP 0919487 A3 20000202

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020615

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010204

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB NL

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI