Global Patent Index - EP 0919607 A3

EP 0919607 A3 2000-08-09 - Lubricant for mechanical working of materials and additive for the lubricant

Title (en)

Lubricant for mechanical working of materials and additive for the lubricant

Title (de)

Schmierstoff für die mechanische Bearbeitung bzw. Verarbeitung von Werkstoffen sowie Additiv für einen Schmierstoff

Title (fr)

Lubrifiant d'usinage mécanique de matériaux et additif pour lubrifiant

Publication

EP 0919607 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122266 A

Priority

DE 19752370 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0919607A2] An aromatic alcohol of specified formula is used in lubricants as a stabilizer. Lubricant for the mechanical processing of materials contains a base compound and an additive to physically and/or microbiologically stabilizing the lubricant. The additive is an aromatic alcohol of formula (I). R1 = H or 1-4 C alkyl; R5 = H or 1-4 C alkyl; and m = 0-4.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 173/00; A01N 31/04; C07C 33/20; C10M 129/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 31/04 (2006.01); C07C 33/20 (2006.01); C10M 129/06 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 173/00 (2006.01); C10M 173/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 129/06 (2013.01); C10M 169/04 (2013.01); C10M 173/00 (2013.01); C10M 173/02 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1006 (2013.01); C10M 2207/021 (2013.01); C10M 2207/044 (2013.01); C10M 2207/046 (2013.01); C10M 2207/126 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2209/107 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1075 (2013.01); C10M 2209/108 (2013.01); C10N 2230/16 (2013.01); C10N 2230/24 (2013.01); C10N 2240/40 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 2209/104 + C10M 2209/109

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0919607 A2 19990602; EP 0919607 A3 20000809; DE 19854151 A1 19990909

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040826

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010131

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: RHENUS LUB GMBH & CO. KG

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 10M 173/00 A, 7C 10M 129/06 B, 7A 01N 31/04 B, 7C 07C 33/20 B, 7C 10N 30:16 Z

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI