Global Patent Index - EP 0919662 A3

EP 0919662 A3 2000-04-26 - Refining pulp

Title (en)

Refining pulp

Title (de)

Scheibenmühle für Papierfaserstoff

Title (fr)

Raffineur de pâte à papier

Publication

EP 0919662 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309446 A

Priority

GB 9724750 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2331469A] A pulp refiner 10 incorporates at least one rotatable disc 12 connected to a drive shaft 14. Stock consisting of pulp in water is supplied to the refiner through an inlet 22 causing the stock to pass between the rotating disc 12 and an adjacent face of a stator disc 38 to refine the pulp. The rotor disc 12 is caused to rotate sequentially faster and slower than the surrounding stock in order to assist the shredding, opening and fibrillating of the pulp. The refining process is maximised by inducing resonance of the rotor disc 12 in the same circumferential direction as its rotation, with the flexure that permits such resonance coming from slight torsional movement of the shaft 14. The resonance is monitored and consequently adjusted to maximise circumferential vibration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21D 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21D 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21D 1/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2331469 A 19990526; GB 9724750 D0 19980121; EP 0919662 A2 19990602; EP 0919662 A3 20000426

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI