Global Patent Index - EP 0919682 B1

EP 0919682 B1 2003-06-18 - Casing for the actuation mechanism of an espagnolette fastening device for doors, windows or similar

Title (en)

Casing for the actuation mechanism of an espagnolette fastening device for doors, windows or similar

Title (de)

Getriebegehäuse für ein Treibstangenschloss einer Tür, eines Fensters, od. dgl

Title (fr)

Boîtier de commande pour crémone à têtière pour portes, fenêtres, porte-fenêtres ou analogue

Publication

EP 0919682 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402576 A

Priority

FR 9715046 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0919682A1] The control box comprises a housing (1) with a rotary nut (3) connected to a bracket (4) extending in the same direction as the bolts (2a). One face of the housing has a recess (6) containing a component (8) which cooperates with a lug (7) on the bracket to lock it when the nut is rotated into the locked position of the bolts. The bracket is able to move between positions where the lug can be at one end of the recesses or the other, and the locking component comprises a notch in the edge of the recess adjacent to the nut's axis of rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/04; E05C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/20 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/04 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/042 (2013.01); E05B 17/2053 (2013.01); E05C 9/02 (2013.01); E05C 9/041 (2013.01); E05B 15/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0919682 A1 19990602; EP 0919682 B1 20030618; DE 69815637 D1 20030724; DE 69815637 T2 20040429; ES 2200288 T3 20040301; FR 2771766 A1 19990604; FR 2771766 B1 20000107

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071016

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071017

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061016

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061016

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051012

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200288 T3

2003-09-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815637 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011114

2000-02-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990604

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI