Global Patent Index - EP 0919684 B1

EP 0919684 B1 2002-09-18 - Stay

Title (en)

Stay

Title (de)

Feststeller

Title (fr)

Entrebaîlleur

Publication

EP 0919684 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402741 A

Priority

FR 9715047 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0919684A1] The window stay has a plate (9) fastened to a window frame cross-member (7), and an arm (10) which can pivot on the plate about an axis (11) perpendicular to it. The free end of the arm has a hole (13) receiving the end of a locking mechanism (5) when the window is held in a half-open position. The arm and plate also have components to limit the rotation of the arm to an angle (A) of between 90 degrees and 180 degrees , while in its retracted position the arm extends away from the long bolt catch plate (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/14; E05C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/16 (2006.01); E05C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/166 (2013.01); E05C 9/1808 (2013.01); E05C 9/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0919684 A1 19990602; EP 0919684 B1 20020918; AT 224499 T 20021015; DE 69808023 D1 20021024; FR 2771767 A1 19990604; FR 2771767 B1 20000107

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081103

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERCO INTERNATIONAL FERRURES ET SERRURES DE BATIM

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020918

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-19 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808023 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224499 T 20021015

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020306

2000-02-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES GB IT NL

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990604

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT NL

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI