Global Patent Index - EP 0919771 B1

EP 0919771 B1 2000-11-29 - Combustion process for solid material on a water-cooled sliding grate as well as gratebar and grate for carrying out the process

Title (en)

Combustion process for solid material on a water-cooled sliding grate as well as gratebar and grate for carrying out the process

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verbrennen von Feststoffen auf einem wassergekühlten Schub-Verbrennungsrost, sowie Rostplatte und Rost zur Ausübung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de combustion pour matières solides sur une grille coulissante refroidie par eau, ainsi que barreau de grille et grille pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0919771 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810971 A

Priority

  • CH 249897 A
  • CH 99098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0919771A2] The combustion method uses a moving combustion grid with a number of baffle elements (10) supported by the top surfaces of the grid plates (1-4), for deflection of the primary combustion air supplied to the combustion bed via the combustion grid. An Independent claim is also included for a moving combustion grid for solid fuel combustion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 1/02; F23H 3/02; F23H 7/06; F23L 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/00 (2006.01); F23G 5/44 (2006.01); F23H 1/02 (2006.01); F23H 3/02 (2006.01); F23H 7/08 (2006.01); F23L 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 7/08 (2013.01); F23H 1/02 (2013.01); F23H 3/02 (2013.01); F23L 1/02 (2013.01); F23H 2900/03021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0919771 A2 19990602; EP 0919771 A3 19990707; EP 0919771 B1 20001129; AT 197845 T 20001215; CA 2249842 A1 19990429; DE 59800363 D1 20010104; JP 3037666 B2 20000424; JP H11211045 A 19990806; NO 984541 A 19990430; NO 984541 D0 19980929; US 6155184 A 20001205

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2002-12-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021216

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020930

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020919

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DOIKOS INVESTMENTS LTD

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-08-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-05-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FELBER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800363 20010104

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-11-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197845 T 20001215

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990923

2000-03-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990923

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990728

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI