Global Patent Index - EP 0919775 A3

EP 0919775 A3 2000-10-04 - Cooking hob with tapered contour cooling modules

Title (en)

Cooking hob with tapered contour cooling modules

Title (de)

Kochfeld mit Kochmodulen mit sich verjüngender Kontur

Title (fr)

Plan de cuisson avec modules de cuisson à contour aminci

Publication

EP 0919775 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115227 A

Priority

DE 19752295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19752295C1] The cooking hob has a number of cooking modules (11,12,13), each provided with a cooking zone (4) with an associated heating device and an operating device (5) for controlling the operation of the heating device, the contour (10) of each cooking module tapered from the cooking zone in the direction of the operating device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/00; F24C 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/105 (2013.01); F24C 15/102 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19752295 C1 19990225; EP 0919775 A2 19990602; EP 0919775 A3 20001004

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010213

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI