Global Patent Index - EP 0919784 A3

EP 0919784 A3 2001-05-16 - Device to determine three dimensional data from objects

Title (en)

Device to determine three dimensional data from objects

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung von dreidimensionalen Daten von Objekten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour déterminer des indications numériques tridimensionnelles d'objets

Publication

EP 0919784 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122269 A

Priority

DE 19753246 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0919784A2] The device has an illuminating device or projector (3), which generates a large number of individually controllable projection points that are individually controlled by a coding device, such as a computer (1), so that an optical pattern is produced about the object (4). Light reflected from the object is collected by an imaging device or video camera (5) and the collected data analyzed using the computer (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01B 11/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/245 (2006.01); G01B 11/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/2509 (2013.01); G01B 11/245 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 19511160 A1 19961002 - LAMPALZER RALF [DE]
  • [X] DE 3829925 A1 19900315 - KALTENBACH & VOIGT [DE]
  • [DA] DE 4115445 A1 19920123 - MALZ REINHARD [DE]
  • [A] US 4987432 A 19910122 - LANDWEHR ULRICH M [DE]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 342 (C - 0743) 24 July 1990 (1990-07-24)
  • [X] "DREIDIMENSIONALE OBJEKTVERMESSUNG", NTZ NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT,DE,VDE VERLAG GMBH. BERLIN, vol. 46, no. 10, 1 October 1993 (1993-10-01), pages 791, XP000400604, ISSN: 0027-707X
  • [A] STEIN N: "VIRTUELL ODER REALITAET. SCHNELLE DREIDIMENSIONALE GANZKOERPERVERMESSUNG", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK,DE,VDE VERLAG GMBH. BERLIN, vol. 50, no. 5, 1 May 1996 (1996-05-01), pages 236 - 240, XP000592203, ISSN: 0015-0142

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0919784 A2 19990602; EP 0919784 A3 20010516; DE 19753246 A1 19990610; DE 19753246 C2 20021128

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011117

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI