Global patent index - EP 0919906 A3

EP 0919906 A3 2000-08-16 - Control method

Title (en)

Control method

Title (de)

Steuerungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Méthode de contrôle

Publication

EP 0919906 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98122162 A

Priority

JP 32573997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0919906A2] A control method is to monitor a person's attributes and based on the results, in predetermined content of the control, to control equipment to be controlled, further, to monitor said person's peripheral environment and also by using these results to execute said control. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/00 (2006.01); G06F 3/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/017 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0694833 A1 19960131 - AT & T CORP [US]
  • [A] EP 0600605 A2 19940608 - HITACHI LTD [JP]
  • [X] YASUHITO SUENAGA ET AL: "HUMAN READER: AN ADVANCED MAN-MACHINE INTERFACE BASED ON HUMAN IMAGES AND SPEECH", SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS IN JAPAN,US,SCRIPTA TECHNICA JOURNALS. NEW YORK, vol. 24, no. 2, 1 January 1993 (1993-01-01), pages 88 - 101, XP000417666, ISSN: 0882-1666
  • [X] PAVLOVIC V I ET AL: "VISUAL INTERPRETATION OF HAND GESTURES FOR HUMAN-COMPUTER INTERACTION: A REVIEW", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 19, no. 7, 1 July 1997 (1997-07-01), pages 677 - 695, XP000698168, ISSN: 0162-8828
  • [A] "DIURNAL SOUND CONTROL FOR PERSONAL COMPUTERS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, vol. 36, no. 10, 1 October 1993 (1993-10-01), pages 549 - 552, XP000412481, ISSN: 0018-8689
  • [A] "LIGHT-CONTROLLED SOFTWARE PRODUCTS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, vol. 35, no. 3, 1 August 1992 (1992-08-01), pages 267 - 269, XP000326265, ISSN: 0018-8689

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0919906 A2 19990602; EP 0919906 A3 20000816; EP 0919906 B1 20050525; CN 1198244 C 20050420; CN 1223391 A 19990721; DE 69830295 D1 20050630; DE 69830295 T2 20051013; TW 494308 B 20020711; US 6353764 B1 20020305

INPADOC legal status

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071125

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051102

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071125

2006-11-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69830295

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-05-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030519

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI