Global Patent Index - EP 0919965 A3

EP 0919965 A3 2000-08-02 - Gaming machines providing bonus games

Title (en)

Gaming machines providing bonus games

Title (de)

Spielautomat mit Bonusspiel

Title (fr)

Machine de jeu avec prix supplementaire

Publication

EP 0919965 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98111289 A

Priority

US 91125497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0919965A2] A gaming machine includes main and secondary displays. The secondary display is disposed apart from the primary display and is used for presenting primary, secondary, or even tertiary information. The main display is controlled electronically by a gaming machine controller, which main display presents the results of a play on the gaming machine. In the case of a slot machine, the main display may be the glass display through which the spinning reels of a game play are viewed. In a video poker gaming machine, the main display is usually a cathode ray tube ("CRT") which displays a video game image to the player and other information directly associated with the game play. The secondary display may be provided at various locations on the gaming machine such as in a top glass portion of the gaming machine or a belly glass portion of the gaming machine, which belly glass portion is located below a main display portion of the gaming machine. The secondary display itself may be a liquid crystal display, a cathode ray tube, a field emission display, a plasma display, a digital micromirror device (DMD), etc.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 5/04 (2006.01); G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3244 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0919965 A2 19990602; EP 0919965 A3 20000802; AR 016777 A1 20010801; AU 755826 B2 20021219; AU 7885398 A 19990218; BR 9806530 A 20010313; CA 2238678 A1 19990208; CA 2238678 C 20040224; JP H11114137 A 19990427; ZA 9807115 B 19990317

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050805

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050125

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IGT

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI