Global Patent Index - EP 0920041 A3

EP 0920041 A3 2000-05-10 - Switching insert for rotary switch

Title (en)

Switching insert for rotary switch

Title (de)

Schaltereinsatz für Drehschalter

Title (fr)

Elément commutateur à insérer pour interrupteur rotatif

Publication

EP 0920041 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116249 A

Priority

DE 19753079 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19753079C1] The switch insert includes a contact plate with loop segments and plug connection leads for providing current and switching. The insert also has a first switch loop (7) which can be adjusted by the rotary switch. The segments are arranged in a plastics plate such that they are contacted from the other side by a further switch loop. The contacts of the further switch loop form a mirror image with the contacts of the first switch loop. The further switch loop (9) has guide extensions (12). These extend through guide recesses (13) of the first switch loop (7) and hold a leaf spring in a holder slit (14). The leaf spring (15) is supported under spring tension on the surface of the switch loop furthest from the contacts (11). The contacts of both switch loops (7,9) are thus biased against the segments (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 19/10; H01H 1/36; H01H 19/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/58 (2006.01); H01H 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/58 (2013.01); H01H 1/365 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19753079 C1 19981029; EP 0920041 A2 19990602; EP 0920041 A3 20000510; EP 0920041 B1 20050420; US 6066813 A 20000523

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812743

- Effective date: 20110301

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050420

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2006-06-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2005-11-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050420

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812743 P 20050525

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050420

2005-04-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050420

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PREH GMBH

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 19/10 A, 7H 01H 19/58 B, 7H 01H 1/36 B

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI