Global Patent Index - EP 0920072 B1

EP 0920072 B1 2002-09-11 - Electronically scanned phased-array antenna for a satellite radio terminal

Title (en)

Electronically scanned phased-array antenna for a satellite radio terminal

Title (de)

Elektronisch phasengesteuerte Antenne in einem Satellitenfunk-Terminal

Title (fr)

Antenne à commande électronique de phase pour terminal de télécommunications par satellite

Publication

EP 0920072 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98122051 A

Priority

DE 19752160 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0920072A2] The electronic phase controlled antenna (2) is a linear one dimensional antenna whose main horn can be electronically pivoted in only one dimension. The antenna is arranged on a mechanically driven pivot device (1). The pivoting of the pivotal plane of the antenna can be in any spatial position. The antenna is positioned by the control device such that the pivotal plane of the antenna horn contains both the two satellites and also the terminal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/26; H01Q 3/08; H01Q 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/08 (2006.01); H01Q 3/26 (2006.01); H01Q 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/26 (2013.01); H01Q 3/08 (2013.01); H01Q 25/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0920072 A2 19990602; EP 0920072 A3 19991124; EP 0920072 B1 20020911; DE 19752160 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141120

2014-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805495

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNERSCHAFT VO, DE

2014-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805495

- Representative's name: DOMPATENT VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNE, DE

2014-05-15 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59805495

- Effective date: 20140329

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061120

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061120

2005-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805495 20021017

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-08-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

1999-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6H 01Q 3/26 A, 6H 01Q 3/08 B, 6H 01Q 25/00 B

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI