Global Patent Index - EP 0920089 A3

EP 0920089 A3 2000-11-29 - A plug

Title (en)

A plug

Title (de)

Ein Stecker

Title (fr)

Une fiche

Publication

EP 0920089 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309758 A

Priority

GB 9725469 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0920089A2] The invention relates to a plug (1) for providing electrical connection for at least two devices (not shown), comprising a fixed (2) and a movable (3) connector. The plug (1) has a body (4) with a tubular socket at one end comprising the fixed connector (2) and an extension (10) for plugging into an existing cigar or cigarette port of a vehicle. The movable connector (3) comprises a spool (6) rotatably mounted on and rotatable about the port (2). The movable connector is in the form of an electrical lead with a plug (5) on the opposite end to that connected to the body (4) and can be unwound by rotation of the connector to a desired amount for connection with a second appliance, the first connector (2) making connection with a first appliance. There is an elastic strap (7) for retaining the lead in position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 17/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/72 (2006.01); H01R 24/58 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/72 (2013.01); H01R 24/58 (2013.01); H01R 2201/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0920089 A2 19990602; EP 0920089 A3 20001129; GB 9725469 D0 19980128; JP H11224734 A 19990817; SG 73585 A1 20000620; TW 431701 U 20010421

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-09-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI