Global Patent Index - EP 0920240 A3

EP 0920240 A3 2000-01-05 - A high-frequency energy supply means, and a high-frequency eletrodeless discharge lamp device

Title (en)

A high-frequency energy supply means, and a high-frequency eletrodeless discharge lamp device

Title (de)

Hochfrequente Leistungsversorgung und elektrodenlose Hochfrequenzlampe

Title (fr)

Alimentation en énergie haute fréquence et lampe sans électrodes à haute fréquence

Publication

EP 0920240 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98122476 A

Priority

JP 32777697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0920240A2] A high-frequency energy supply device has a group of side resonators which are electrically connected in a practically annular form, and supply high-frequency energy using resonant high-frequency electromagnetic fields generated in the center portion; and a plurality of high-frequency coupling part for coupling a plurality of high frequency energies propagated from a plurality of high-frequency propagation paths to said group of side resonators; wherein a plurality of high frequencies coupled to said group of side resonators from said plurality of high-frequency coupling means have phases and/or frequencies different from each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/24; H01J 65/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 65/04 (2006.01); H05B 41/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 65/044 (2013.01); H05B 41/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0920240 A2 19990602; EP 0920240 A3 20000105; EP 0920240 B1 20040811; CN 1218979 A 19990609; DE 69825546 D1 20040916; DE 69825546 T2 20041230; TW 430855 B 20010421

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071126

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071126

2006-11-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-03-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69825546 P 20040916

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 37/32 A

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 05H 1/18 B

2004-03-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A HIGH-FREQUENCY ENERGY SUPPLY MEANS FOR A HIGH-FREQUENCY ELETRODELESS DISCHARGE LAMP DEVICE

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030325

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI